RI H8192 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends DOT authority to lease airport property to 50 years. Increase to 9 the directors on the airport corporation board.
Title
Airports And Landing Fields
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2018) |
2018-05-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8192.pdf |