RI H8190 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the period of time a voter may have to change their party affiliation from the 90th day preceding any primary election for which the voter is eligible to the 29th day preceding any primary election for which the voter is eligible.
Title
Registration Of Voters
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8190.pdf |