RI H8178 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Finance Construction, Renovations, Remediation, Alterations, Additions And Other Improvements And/or Related Equipment And To Issue Not More Than $27,000,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor, Of Which Up To $13,500,000 Is For School Purposes And Up To $13,500,000 Is For Other Town Purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Finance Construction, Renovations, Remediation, Alterations, Additions And Other Improvements And/or Related Equipment And To Issue Not More Than $27,000,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor, Of Which Up To $13,500,000 Is For School Purposes And Up To $13,500,000 Is For Other Town Purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-22SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-18HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018)
2018-05-18HouseCommittee transferred to House Finance
2018-05-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018)
2018-05-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback