RI H8178 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Finance Construction, Renovations, Remediation, Alterations, Additions And Other Improvements And/or Related Equipment And To Issue Not More Than $27,000,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor, Of Which Up To $13,500,000 Is For School Purposes And Up To $13,500,000 Is For Other Town Purposes
Title
Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Finance Construction, Renovations, Remediation, Alterations, Additions And Other Improvements And/or Related Equipment And To Issue Not More Than $27,000,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor, Of Which Up To $13,500,000 Is For School Purposes And Up To $13,500,000 Is For Other Town Purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018) |
2018-05-18 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018) |
2018-05-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |