RI H8171 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a Class B-C liquor license allowing 24 hour casinos to expand their service of alcohol on Fridays, Saturdays and nights before legal holidays.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2014) |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |