RI H8170 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Takes away the discretion of the sentencing judge in cases involving persons convicted of, or who entered a plea of nolo contendere to any misdemeanor or felony under the provisions of state law relating to cruelty to animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Animals and animal husbandry approval of amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-06-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed as amended in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-21HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018)
2018-05-04HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback