RI H8165 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds thermal systems insulation to the regulation and licensing of mechanical trades.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mechanical Trades

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-05-07HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (05/08/2018)
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-05-04HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback