RI H8163 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows domestic insurance company to enter into a voluntary restructuring, including the use of a protected cell, with the approval of the commissioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary Restructuring Of Solvent Insurers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-19HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-05-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018)
2018-05-04HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback