RI H8147 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates For The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Towing Storage Act's Provisions Relative To Police Seizures Of Vehicles (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates For The Commission To Study The Towing Storage Act's Provisions Relative To Police Seizures Of Vehicles From May 24, 2018, To May 23, 2019, And Would Expire On June 6, 2019.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates For The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Towing Storage Act's Provisions Relative To Police Seizures Of Vehicles (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates For The Commission To Study The Towing Storage Act's Provisions Relative To Police Seizures Of Vehicles From May 24, 2018, To May 23, 2019, And Would Expire On June 6, 2019.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/07/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-05-02HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback