RI H8142 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the city of Providence to exempt 11 Lowell Avenue, 187 Pocasset Avenue and 191 Pocasset Avenue from the provisions of ยง 3-7-19 which would prohibit the retail sale of alcoholic beverages at that location.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-14SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2018)
2018-06-07HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for consideration (06/07/2018)
2018-05-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018)
2018-04-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback