RI H8141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permit a municipality or school district to opt to hold classes on election days; provided that the classes do not disrupt or interfere with the election process.
Title
Conduct Of Election
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2014) |
2014-05-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H8141.pdf |