RI H8138 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Environmental Management To Continue Collaborating With The Pollinator Working Group Established To Make Findings And Recommendations With Regard To Maintaining, Protecting And Enhancing Pollinator Habitat And Health In Rhode Island

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Environmental Management To Continue Collaborating With The Pollinator Working Group Established To Make Findings And Recommendations With Regard To Maintaining, Protecting And Enhancing Pollinator Habitat And Health In Rhode Island

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2018)
2018-04-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback