RI H8126 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds the town of Burrillville to those towns wherein taxes assessed on a mobile or manufactured home would constitute a lien on said home.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collection Of Taxes Generally

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-05-24HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2018)
2018-04-26HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback