RI H8125 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the student academic counseling center located in the athletic complex sector of campus at Rhode Island college in Providence, the "Ann Cullen student-athlete success center."
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices, And Other State Constructions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8125.pdf |