RI H8125 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Commercial Law - Other Regulatory Provisions - Unfair Sales Practices (would Allow Credit File Monitoring Services To Require Social Security Numbers From Customers.)
Title
An Act Relating To Commercial Law - Other Regulatory Provisions - Unfair Sales Practices (would Allow Credit File Monitoring Services To Require Social Security Numbers From Customers.)
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-05-19 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2012) | |
2012-05-08 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8125.pdf |