RI H8123 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows municipal water supply system and any regional water quality management district commission to enter into an agreement called a "transaction" effectively merging the entities and becoming a public utility.
Title
The Municipal Water Supply Systems Transactions Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018) |
2018-04-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8123.pdf |