RI H8119 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a universal, comprehensive, affordable single-payer health care insurance program and helps control health care costs, which would be referred to as, "the Rhode Island Comprehensive Health Insurance Program" (RICHIP).
Title
Comprehensive Health Insurance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-04-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8119.pdf |