RI H8119 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the use of stunguns/tasers after issuance of permit from attorney general.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018)
2018-04-26HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback