RI H8117 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the requirement that a city or town's educational funding (maintenance of effort) be increased by the same percentage as the total state aid provided and applies retroactively to January 1, 2019.
Title
The Paul W. Crowley Rhode Island Student Investment Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2022) |
2022-04-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8117.pdf |