RI H8110 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the entitlement for a special plate to all recipients of the top medals which may be awarded to members of the United States Armed Forces.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-04-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8110.pdf |