RI H8102 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Permits emergency mail ballot applications to be processed at voter's board of canvassers in person on electronic poll pads allowing the voter to then cast his or her ballot and place the ballot in the state-approved voting machine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mail Ballots

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22HouseSigned by Governor
2020-07-17HouseTransmitted to Governor
2020-07-16SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2020-07-16SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/16/2020)
2020-07-16HouseHouse passed Sub A
2020-07-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (07/16/2020)
2020-07-14HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2020-07-13HouseProposed Substitute
2020-07-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/14/2020)
2020-07-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback