RI H8099 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the law pertaining to tax classifications in the town of Johnston to allow it to enact tax classifications in accordance with the nature of the real and personal property to be taxed.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes -- Town Of Johnston Tax Classification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-17 | House | House read and passed |
2022-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2022) |
2022-05-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2022) |
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |