RI H8098 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Blanken Realty Corporation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Blanken Realty Corporation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-05HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-05SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/05/2018)
2018-05-23HouseHouse read and passed
2018-05-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/23/2018)
2018-05-15HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-04-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-04-13HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback