RI H8096 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Dale Court Condominium Association, Inc.
Title
An Act Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Dale Court Condominium Association, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-03 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-20 | House read and passed | |
2010-05-18 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-05-18 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-06 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H8096.pdf |