RI H8095 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes members of an individual's family and legally responsible adults to receive payment for delivering home and community based services to developmentally disabled adults and children with special needs.
Title
Cooperation With Federal Government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8095.pdf |