RI H8090 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Meeting postponed (06/05/2018)
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits the taking of domesticated and undomesticated game birds on a shooting preserve subject to certain requirements on licensing, shooting area and records required to be kept.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Field Trials And Shooting Preserves

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04HouseMeeting postponed (06/05/2018)
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for consideration
2018-04-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-04-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback