RI H8082 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that school bus drivers' annual training include the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration's school bus driver in-service training series.
Title
Operators' And Chauffeurs' Licenses - School Bus Driver Annual Training
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-17 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/04/2016) |
2016-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2016) |
2016-04-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |