RI H8081 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Charlestown, by ordinance, to offer tax dollar credit reductions in lieu of various tax exemptions.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation - Town Of Charlestown
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2018) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2018-06-06 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2018) |
2018-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-04-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |