RI H8068 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits cities and towns to issue special events liquor licenses to permit the equivalent of one-day licenses one day each month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Licenses -- Special Events License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-04-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-04-06HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback