RI H8066 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases funding appropriated to staffing for developmental disabilities direct support services by an equal amount when an increase of the minimum wage rate occurs.
Title
Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-04-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8066.pdf |