RI H8062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the due date for the district action plan each and every year from September 1 to December 1, and further require that there are no fewer than five (5) school district education reviews annually beginning in academic year 2025-2026.
Title
Education Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2022-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-13 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-05-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2022) |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/28/2022) |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-03-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |