RI H8060 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the issuance of utility bill credits to customers of electrical or cable television providers when the customer's service is interrupted for a period of one hundred sixty-eight (168) hours within a thirty (30) day period.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-04-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8060.pdf |