RI H8057 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the eligibility period for cash assistance under the Rhode Island Works Program.
Title
The Rhode Island Works Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-04-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H8057.pdf |