RI H8054 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Names the welcome center at the University of Rhode Island "The Robert J. Higgins Welcome Center."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naming The University Of Rhode Island Welcome Center

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-12HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-12SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-07SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2018)
2018-06-06SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018)
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
2018-05-30HouseHouse read and passed
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-04-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback