RI H8054 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the welcome center at the University of Rhode Island "The Robert J. Higgins Welcome Center."
Title
Naming The University Of Rhode Island Welcome Center
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2018) |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2018-05-30 | House | House read and passed |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2018) |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2018) |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |