RI H8043 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Michael J. Crocker, Esq., to join Michelle Marie Outhouse and Christopher Kenneth O'Rourke in marriage on or about August 31, 2018, within the Town of Narragansett, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-04-24HouseHouse read and passed
2018-04-17HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (04/24/2018)
2018-04-12HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018)
2018-04-04HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback