RI H8033 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Enables cities and towns to provide property tax relief to individuals who take resiliency measures to rehabilitate their property because of flood hazards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal And Riverine Home Protection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-04-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
2018-04-12HouseCommittee transferred to House Municipal Government
2018-03-30HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback