RI H8032 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Senate passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes that the building at 4 Howard Avenue in the city of Cranston would hereafter be named and known as the "Attorney General Julius C. Michaelson Customer Service Center."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-20SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-14HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/14/2018)
2018-04-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
2018-03-30HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback