RI H8029 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminates the requirement that a renewal applicant, whose commercial driver's license has expired for more than one year, take examinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Uniform Commercial Driver's License Act -- Application, Examination And Issuance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-20SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-14SenateReferred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
2018-06-13HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2018)
2018-06-05HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-04-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-03-30HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback