RI H8028 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables fishermen aggrieved by confiscation of their gear and/or catch to retrieve their gear on posting a bond, and to be compensated if the violation if any, is found not to be significant or substantial.
Title
General Provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2018-04-09 | House | Meeting postponed (04/12/2018) |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-03-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8028.pdf |