RI H8025 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Homer Darrell Callicutt to join Toni Lee Courvilee and Joseph Michael Doiley in marriage on or about July 3, 2018, within the Town of Narragansett, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-05-30HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-30SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-24SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-04-24HouseHouse read and passed
2018-04-17HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (04/24/2018)
2018-04-12HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018)
2018-03-29HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback