RI H8009 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Possession of one ounce of a controlled substance is reduced to a misdemeanor.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-03-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8009.pdf |