RI H8001 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ONE IN EACH OF THE TOWNS OF CHARLESTOWN, RICHMOND AND HOPKINTON) AND IMPROVEMENTS AT THE SWITCH ROAD CAMPUS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, COSTS OF DEMOLITION, DESIGN, HEALTH AND SAFETY PROJECTS, PLAYGROUNDS, LANDSCAPING, PAVING AND ALL EXPENSES INCIDENTAL THERETO BY THE ISSUANCE OF NOT MORE THAN $150,000,000 BONDS AND/OR NOTES THEREFOR, SUBJECT TO APPROVAL OF STATE HOUSING AID AT A REIMBURSEMENT RATE OR STATE SHARE RATIO OF NOT LESS THAN 61% AT THE TIME OF ISSUANCE, WHICH RATE OR RATIO MAY INCREASE TO MORE THAN 76% AT PROJECT COMPLETION (Authorizes the Chariho Regional School District to finance the construction, furnishing and equipping of three elementary schools (one in each of the towns of Charlestown, Richmond and Hopkinton) and improvements at the Switch Road Campus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUTHORIZING THE CHARIHO REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT TO FINANCE THE CONSTRUCTION, FURNISHING AND EQUIPPING OF THREE ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-29HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2024-03-21HouseTransmitted to Governor
2024-03-21SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2024-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/21/2024)
2024-03-19HouseHouse read and passed
2024-03-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/19/2024)
2024-03-12HouseCommittee recommends passage
2024-03-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024)
2024-03-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback