RI H7992 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the supported decision-making act which is a less restrictive alternative to guardianship for utilization of the probate courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supported Decision-making Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-05-29HouseHouse read and passed
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/29/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-03-23HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback