RI H7985 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all entities receiving tax credits from the state pay their workers the prevailing wage or other payments pursuant to ยง 37-13. This act would also allow the revocation of the tax credits for violation of this act.
Title
Rebuild Rhode Island Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-02 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-03-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |