RI H7984 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that signage for automated school-zone-speed-enforcement systems include lights, limits hours of operation to 6:00 a.m. and 6:00 p.m. and sets the fine at thirty-five dollars ($35.00) payable in thirty (30) days.
Title
Automated School-zone-speed-enforcement System Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7984.pdf |