RI H7974 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all public secondary schools to provide a working science laboratory for all students studying science, technology, engineering or mathematics.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-10 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/11/2018) |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-03-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7974.pdf |