RI H7972 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Roberts And Rocha, Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Roberts And Rocha, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/03/2022) |
2022-04-05 | House | House read and passed |
2022-04-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |