RI H7956 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for more conspicuous signage at automated school-zone-speed-enforcement system locations and allows for a graduated penalty system with a warning for a first offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automated School-zone-speed-enforcement System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Enforcement system approval of amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub B as amended in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-22SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-20SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2018-06-18SenateScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-05-24HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-05-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/24/2018)
2018-05-15HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-03-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback