RI H7955 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the criminal prohibition against painting, printing or affixing advertisements to signs and billboards within limits of public highways without the written consent of the chief of police of the city or town in which the highway is located.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highways

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018)
2018-03-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback